FL S0122 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "Stillbirth and SUID Education and Awareness Act." Requires the State Surgeon General to implement a public health awareness and education campaign in order to provide information that is focused on decreasing the risk factors for sudden unexpected infant death and sudden unexplained death in childhood. Specifies the duties of the State Surgeon General related to maternal and child health programs. Requires the State Surgeon General to establish a task force, etc.
Title
Sudden Unexpected Infant Death
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 20 | |
2010-11-29 | Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 20 | |
2010-11-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0561 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/122 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0122/BillText/Filed/HTML |