FL S0122 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
(THIS BILL COMBINED IN CS/S130 & S122) Requiring the county sheriff or municipal police to issue reasonable guidelines for the operation of a neighborhood crime watch program; authorizing a person to use force, except deadly force in the defense of property; providing that a person who uses force is immune from civil action brought by the person or persons against whom the force is used; providing that a law enforcement agency's right and duty to fully investigate the use of force upon which the claim of immunity is based is not restricted; directing the Department of Law Enforcement to collect, process, maintain, and disseminate information and data on all incidents concerning the alleged justifiable use of force in this state, etc.
Title
Self-defense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 130 (Died in Judiciary) |
2013-10-08 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | CS combines this bill with SB 130 |
2013-09-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 10/08/13, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Fav/CS Combined |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0033 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 89 (Ch. 2014-195)
S0130 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 89 (Ch. 2014-195)
S0130 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 89 (Ch. 2014-195)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166 | 0485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/122 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0122/BillText/Filed/HTML |