FL S0122 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Jordan's Law"; expanding the list of entities with access to certain records that relate to child abandonment, abuse, or neglect held by the Department of Children and Families; authorizing the parent or legal guardian of a child to request a second medical evaluation of a child under certain circumstances; revising the definition of the terms "guardian ad litem" and "guardian advocate"; requiring a lead agency to ensure that certain individuals receive specified training relating to head trauma and brain injuries in children younger than a specified age, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
2020-03-05SenateSubstituted CS/HB 43
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-09-03SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-08-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H43 (Same As) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-40
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7063 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H7085 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
398296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94317298Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/251124/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/522422/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/412980/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/894626/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/409736/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/172158/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/122/Amendment/617230/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback