FL S0122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "newborn infant", etc.
Title
Surrendered Newborn Infants
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Sen. Ileana Garcia [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 133 (Died in returning Messages) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 4 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/09/21, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/27/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H133 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 0423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |