FL S0136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 7030 (Ch. 2019-22)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 7030 (Ch. 2019-22)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding school guardians to the list of officials the false personation of whom is prohibited and is subject to criminal penalties, etc.
Title
False Personation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 7030 (Ch. 2019-22) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7030 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Chapter No. 2019-22
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/136 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/136/BillText/Filed/HTML |