FL S0138 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 922 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 922 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "T. Patt Maney Veterans' Treatment Intervention Act;" providing that a person found to have committed a criminal offense who alleges that the offense resulted from posttraumatic stress disorder, traumatic brain injury, substance use disorder, or psychological problems stemming from service in a combat theater in the United States military may have a hearing on that issue before sentencing; providing that a defendant found to have committed an offense due to such causes and who is eligible for probation or community control may be placed in a treatment program in certain circumstances; exempting treatment services provided by the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the United States Department of Veterans Affairs from certain contract requirements, etc.
Title
Military Veterans Convicted of Criminal Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennett [R] | Sen. Nancy Detert [R] | Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 922 (Ch. | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 19 | |
2011-10-05 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2011-10-05 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 109 | |
2011-10-04 | Now in Budget -SJ 110 | |
2011-10-04 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 110 | |
2011-09-26 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 10/04/11, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 19 | |
2011-08-29 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
948 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/138 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0138/BillText/Filed/HTML |