FL S0140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "designated holiday"; providing an exemption for the use of fireworks solely and exclusively during a designated holiday; prohibiting homeowners' associations from promulgating certain rules or regulations, etc.
Title
Fireworks
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Sen. Rob Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#677 (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Chapter No. 2020-11 | |
2020-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-04-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 82 NAYS 34 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (918342) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/15/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-11-04 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/04/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H65 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 140 passed