FL S0148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the order for applying the tax credit for employment of the homeless, etc.
Title
Employment for the Homeless [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00020 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Commerce; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0459 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 194 | New Code | See Bill Text |