FL S0148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an appropriation to compensate Scotty Bartek for being wrongfully incarcerated, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Scotty Bartek by the State of Florida

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Special Master on Claim Bills
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-12-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6505 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback