FL S0152 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Medicaid to reimburse for dental services provided in a mobile dental unit that is owned by, operated by, or contracted with a health access setting or another similar setting or program; requiring the chair of the Board of Dentistry to appoint a Council on Dental Therapy effective after a specified timeframe; requiring the board to adopt certain rules relating to dental therapists; providing application requirements and examination and licensure qualifications for dental therapists; limiting the practice of dental therapy to specified settings, etc.
Title
Dental Therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H979 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |