FL S0154 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-10 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the required health education in public schools to include information regarding the dangers and signs of human trafficking; specifying the minimum requirements of the human trafficking education portion of the comprehensive health education curriculum, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking Education in Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-12-10SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-18SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2019-11-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-11-12SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 11/12/19, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Education; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2019-08-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H105 (Same As) 2019-09-23 - Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback