FL S0158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Vulnerable Road User Act"; providing criminal penalties for a person who commits a moving violation that causes serious bodily injury to, or causes the death of, a vulnerable road user; requiring that the person pay a specified fine, serve a minimum period of house arrest, and attend a driver improvement course; requiring that the court revoke the person's driver license for a minimum specified period, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-12-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H71 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
318195Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback