FL S0172 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that firefighter and police officer pension plans meet the requirements of ch. 175 and ch. 185, F.S., respectively, in order to receive certain insurance premium tax revenues; revising the method of creating and maintaining firefighters' and police officers' retirement trust funds; providing that the use of premium tax revenues may deviate from the requirements of ch. 175 and ch. 185, F.S., under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Local Government Pension Reform
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] | Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#303 (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-39 | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 4 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 341 |
2015-04-22 | House | Received |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (829234) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/21/15, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0341 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 172 (Ch. 2015-39)
H1279 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 172 (Ch. 2015-39)
H1279 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 172 (Ch. 2015-39)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
175 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |