FL S0216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain local governments to set aside up to a specified percentage of funds for procuring personal property and services for the purpose of entering into contracts with micro businesses; providing eligibility for micro businesses under the Microfinance Loan Program; providing eligibility for micro businesses under the Department of Transportation's highway project business development program, etc.
Title
Assistance for Micro Businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1425 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
287 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 1135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/216 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/216/BillText/Filed/HTML |