FL S0222 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 827 -SJ 1191
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 827 -SJ 1191
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the conversion of limited agricultural associations to corporations not for profit; specifying a fee for filing a limited agricultural association's certificate of conversion to a domestic corporation; requiring the filing of a certificate of conversion and articles of incorporation with the Department of State; providing that the conversion does not affect any obligation or liability of the association; providing that all rights, property, and obligations of the association are vested in the corporation; specifying that the association is not required to wind up its affairs or pay its liabilities and distribute its assets, etc.
Title
Limited Agricultural Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 827 -SJ 1191 | |
2012-03-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 -SJ 1004 | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 962 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 962 | |
2012-03-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 02/28/12, 2:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-24 | CS/CS by Agriculture read 1st time -SJ 269 | |
2012-01-23 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-23 | CS/CS by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-18 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/23/12, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Agriculture -SJ 111 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time -SJ 100 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 24 | |
2012-01-09 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/09/12, 3:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-09-21 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Agriculture; Budget -SJ 24 | |
2011-09-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
604 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |