FL S0222 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7073 (Ch. 2014-221)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7073 (Ch. 2014-221)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Department of State Technology; requiring the department to develop a long-range plan; establishing the Fletcher Shared Resource Center within the Department of Financial Services to provide enterprise information technology services to the department, to provide colocation services to the Department of Legal Services and the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, and to host the Legislative Appropriations System/Planning and Budgeting Subsystem; authorizing the Department of Legal Affairs and the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to move data center equipment to the center, etc.
Title
State Technology
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7073 (Ch. 2014-221) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0928 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7073 (Ch. 2014-221)
H7073 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-221
H7073 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-221
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
364 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
668 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/222 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0222/BillText/Filed/HTML |