FL S0230 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming the Orlando-Orange County Expressway System as the "Central Florida Expressway System"; providing for the transfer of governance and control, legal rights and powers, responsibilities, terms, and obligations to the authority; extending, to 99 years from 40 years, the term of a lease-purchase agreement; limiting the authority's authority to enter into a lease-purchase agreement; removing the authority and criteria for an authority to waive payment and performance bonds for certain public works projects that are awarded pursuant to an economic development program, etc.
Title
Orlando-Orange County Expressway Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#818 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#818 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-171 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (462213) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted (462213) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 32 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (462213) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | In returning messages |
2014-04-30 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (462213) |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 311 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Received |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (380522) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (200702, 413882) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/13/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/04/14, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/09/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0311 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171)
H0353 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S0772 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
H0353 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S0772 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
348 | 751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 753 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 754 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7543 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7546 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7547 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 756 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 757 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 758 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 759 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 765 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9950 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9958 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9959 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |