FL S0230 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the purpose of patient care networks from serving patients with acquired immune deficiency syndrome to serving those with human immunodeficiency virus; requiring the Department of Health to develop strategies to maximize federal-state partnerships that provide incentives for physicians to practice in medically underserved or rural areas; revising provisions related to the department's rules governing minimum standards for ground ambulances and emergency medical services vehicles; extending through 2025 the Florida Center for Nursing's responsibility to study and issue an annual report on the implementation of nursing education programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
2020-03-13SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 713
2020-03-13SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-12SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-11SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-03-04SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-02-10SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2020-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-23SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-10-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-10-15SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-10-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/15/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2019-09-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S218 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-50
S226 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-29
H221 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 218 passed
S390 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H485 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 226 passed
H677 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1138 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1296 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1461
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H1341 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1461 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-47
H77 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H115 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-125
H707 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S66 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S356 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 115
S474 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1193
S926 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1193 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-160
H731 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3814018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4604166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46600671Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46600672Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94542Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback