FL S0246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the amounts of retainage that local governmental entities and contractors may withhold from progress payments for any construction services contract; revising requirements for Department of Management Services rules governing certain contracts; revising the amounts of retainage that certain public entities and contractors may withhold from progress payments for any construction services contract, etc.
Title
Public Construction
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H101 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
218 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |