FL S0256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "officer, employee, or agent," as it applies to immunity from personal liability in certain actions, to include any member of a child protection team established by the Department of Health in certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Protection Teams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Messages
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-05-02HouseIn Messages
2019-05-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 2
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-13SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-02-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H535 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback