FL S0260 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Agency for Health Care Administration to establish a statewide, centralized registry of persons who have symptoms associated with ST-elevation myocardial infarctions (STEMI); requiring certain health care facilities to report to the registry specified data on the treatment of STEMI patients; requiring the agency to contract with an entity to maintain the registry, subject to a specific appropriation; authorizing the appropriate limited disclosure of records of emergency calls containing patient information to the agency and the contracted entity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STEMI Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H473 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3818175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40130Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback