FL S0260 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the state attorney of each judicial circuit to establish a conviction integrity review unit and an independent review panel within the state attorney's office; authorizing an incarcerated person to submit a petition to the state attorney's office requesting that a unit review his or her conviction; requiring the unit to initiate an investigation if certain conditions are met, etc.
Title
Conviction Integrity Review Units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H299 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/260 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/260/BillText/Filed/HTML |