FL S0268 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing voting to be conducted using a voter interface device that produces a voter-verifiable paper output; revising requirements for Department of State rules regarding manual recounts of certain ballots, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Methods

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-07SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateCS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-06SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-02-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-05SenateCS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/05/19, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H689 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162
H7101 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback