FL S0274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to limit the terms of office for a member of a district school board, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitation on Terms of Office for Members of a District School Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-04-10SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-10SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-12SenateNow in Education
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules
2019-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H229 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback