FL S0288 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an honorary designation of a certain state park in a specified county; designating and redesignating structures in the park; directing the Department of Environmental Protection to erect suitable markers, etc.
Title
State Designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#834 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Chapter No. 2016-243 | |
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 497 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Received |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (155402) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/15/16 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 11/19/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 10/07/15, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Fiscal Policy |
2015-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0497 (Same As) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 288 (Ch. 2016-243)