FL S0288 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Soldiers' and Heroes' Monuments and Memorials Protection Act"; revising the definition of "veteran" to include additional periods of military service; prohibiting specified activities concerning remembrances on public property; prohibiting damage to or removal of certain remembrances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monuments and Memorials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Community Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H97 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
265155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80613Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback