FL S0298 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Florida Rural Jobs and Business Recovery Act"; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to accept applications for approval as growth funds in a specified manner; prohibiting the department from approving more than a certain amount of investment authority or investor contributions; requiring the department to certify approved applications, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateCS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
2019-04-05SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-04SenateCS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-12SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-02-11SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-01-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H739 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
288062Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback