FL S0300 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring specified licensed pharmacists to report certain information to the Department of Health; authorizing pharmacists to test for and treat influenza and streptococcus and providing requirements relating thereto; requiring that a pharmacist notify a patient's primary care provider within a specified time period after providing any such testing or treatment, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Testing for and Treatment of Influenza and Streptococcus

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2019-01-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H81 (Similar To) 2018-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H111 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H815 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651895Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback