FL S0306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the State Housing Trust Fund and the Local Government Housing Trust Fund from a provision authorizing the Legislature, in the General Appropriations Act, to transfer unappropriated cash balances from specified trust funds to the Budget Stabilization Fund and the General Revenue Fund, etc.
Title
State Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H381 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/306 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/306/BillText/Filed/HTML |