FL S0308 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Vulnerable Road User Act"; providing criminal penalties for a person who commits a moving violation that causes serious bodily injury to, or causes the death of, a vulnerable road user; requiring that the person who commits the moving violation pay a specified fine, serve a minimum period of house arrest, and attend a driver improvement course; requiring that the court revoke the person's driver license for a minimum specified period, etc.
Title
Traffic Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H455 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/308 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/308/BillText/Filed/HTML |