FL S0328 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of an electronic communication device to send or receive text-based communications while operating a motor vehicle. Defines the term "text-based communication." Provides exceptions and for enforcement.
Title
State Uniform Traffic Control/Texting Prohibited [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00031 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2009-10-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0041 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation