FL S0344 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to authorize the Legislature, by general law, to prohibit increases in the assessed value of homestead property, for school district levy purposes, if the legal or equitable title to the property is held by a person who is 65 years of age or older and if he or she has held such title and maintained permanent residence on the property for at least 25 years, and to provide an effective date, etc.
Title
Homestead Property Assessments/Prohibition on Increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H317 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
S562 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1205 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
S562 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1205 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee