FL S0346 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the terms "conditional medical release"; expanding eligibility for conditional medical release to include inmates with debilitating illnesses; defining the term "inmate with a debilitating illness"; redefining the term "terminally ill inmate", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conditional Medical Release

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-06SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/06/19, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-01-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H607 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7940115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947149Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback