FL S0356 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 115
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 115
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Keep Our Graduates Working Act of 2020"; prohibiting a state authority from suspending or revoking a person's professional license, certificate, registration, or permit solely on the basis of a delinquency or default in the payment of his or her student loan, etc.
Title
Keep Our Graduates Working Act
Sponsors
Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 115 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 115 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/15/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/12/19, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H115 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-125
H77 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S66 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S474 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1193
S926 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
H1193 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-160
H77 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S66 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S474 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1193
S926 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
H1193 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-160
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |