FL S0364 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the locations where a licensee is prohibited from openly carrying a handgun or carrying a concealed weapon or firearm, etc.
Title
Prohibited Places for Weapons and Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H683 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/364 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/364/BillText/Filed/HTML |