FL S0368 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Statewide Procurement Efficiency Task Force within the department; specifying the purpose and membership of the task force; providing that task force members shall serve without compensation or reimbursement of expenses, etc.
Title
Department of Management Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 12/07/17, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H111 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee