FL S0370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a specified period of incarceration for solicitation of prostitution offenses involving victims of human trafficking, etc.
Title
Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H219 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)