FL S0372 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 171
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 171
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Governors and the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Veterans' Affairs, to create a process for the uniform award of postsecondary credit or career education clock hours to certain servicemembers and veterans of the United States Armed Forces; requiring certain postsecondary institutions to award uniform postsecondary credit or career education clock hours for specified courses taken and occupations held by individuals during their service in the military, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Education for Certain Military Personnel
Sponsors
Senate Education Committee | Sen. Tom Lee [R] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 171 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 171 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/23/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Now in Education |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 11/13/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Education; Appropriations |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H171 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-80
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |