FL S0378 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying conditions that must be met before the Chief Financial Officer may designate a credit union as a qualified public depository; specifying the mutual responsibility and contingent liability of certain credit unions designated as qualified public depositories; providing that certain assessments by the Chief Financial Officer are subject to certain segregation of contingent liability provisions, etc.
Title
Florida Security for Public Deposits Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H335 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
136 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
191 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 06115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/378 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/378/BillText/Filed/HTML |