FL S0384 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the Harris Chain of Lakes Restoration Council, etc.
Title
Harris Chain of Lakes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#685 (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Chapter No. 2020-52 | |
2020-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 4 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/13/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6025 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 384 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 468 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |