FL S0390 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-15 - Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for licensure as a massage therapist; providing applicability for persons who were issued a license as a massage apprentice before a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage Therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2019-09-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S230 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Now in Appropriations
H713 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
S1124 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback