FL S0406 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing physicians to issue physician certifications to specified patients who meet certain conditions; requiring the Department of Health to register caregivers meeting certain requirements on the compassionate use registry; requiring the department to establish a quality control program that requires medical marijuana treatment centers to submit samples from each batch or lot of marijuana to an independent testing laboratory; creating the "Medical Marijuana Research and Education Act"; establishing the Coalition for Medical Marijuana Research and Education within the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, Inc., etc.
Title
Compassionate Use of Low-THC Cannabis and Marijuana
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1397 (Died in House) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/17 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-06 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0614 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1388 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1666 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1758 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H1397 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in House
H1177 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1472 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
S1844 (Related) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
S1388 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1666 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1758 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H1397 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in House
H1177 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1472 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
S1844 (Related) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 4351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 987 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
385 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |