FL S0406 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing threshold amounts for certain theft offenses; revising the list of items the theft of which constitutes theft of the third degree; providing that the value of taken property is based on fair market value at the time of the taking; revising the circumstances under which an offense of retail theft constitutes a felony of the second degree, etc.
Title
Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/06/19, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H589 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 595 (Ch. 2019-81), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 595 (Ch. 2019-81), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 6055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 6305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 743 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 238 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
642 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |