FL S0408 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the sale, purchase, delivery, bringing into this state, or actual or constructive possession of specified amounts of dosage units of certain controlled substances; creating the offense of "trafficking in pharmaceuticals"; providing criminal penalties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-02-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-19SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3736055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8931351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback