FL S0410 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2021-69)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2021-69)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring each school district to publish specified materials on the district website to notify parents of their right to exempt their student from reproductive health and disease education; requiring district school boards to annually approve curriculum relating to reproductive health and disease education in an open, noticed public meeting; requiring each school district to publish specified materials on the district website to notify parents of their right to exempt their student from reproductive health and disease education, etc.
Title
Reproductive Health and Disease Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2021-69) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 545 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Education |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Education; Rules |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H545 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-69
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |