FL S0420 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reducing the period of time within which a contractor must begin to perform certain work on residential real property after receiving initial payment for such work and during which the contractor may refuse to perform substantial work on such property; removing an exemption from permitting requirements for certain solicitors, salespersons, and agents, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H357 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
489126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback