FL S0426 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter No. 2019-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Granting certain benefits to a firefighter upon receiving a diagnosis of cancer if certain conditions are met; requiring an employer to make certain disability payments to a firefighter in the event of a total and permanent disability; providing for death benefits to a firefighter's beneficiary if a firefighter dies as a result of cancer or cancer treatments; adjusting the allocation of funds to provide line-of-duty death benefits for members in the investment plan of the Florida Retirement System, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#202 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03 Chapter No. 2019-21
2019-05-03 Approved by Governor
2019-04-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HouseReceived
2019-04-23HouseSubstituted for HB 7129
2019-04-23HouseIn Messages
2019-04-23SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) adopted (566368)
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-16SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-15SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-11SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-19SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-02-19SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/19/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H857 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 426 (Ch. 2019-21)
S784 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 426 (Ch. 2019-21)
H7129 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 426 (Ch. 2019-21)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121735Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback