FL S0436 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a youth from being placed in disciplinary confinement; authorizing a youth to be placed in emergency confinement if certain conditions are met; limiting the allowable length of time for emergency confinement; authorizing a youth to be placed in medical confinement under certain circumstances; requiring sheriffs and chief correctional officers to adopt model standards relating to youth, etc.
Title
Youth in Confinement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H165 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S228 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H347 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S762 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S228 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H347 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S762 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 279 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/436 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/436/BillText/Filed/HTML |