FL S0446 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing owners of commercial or industrial businesses, or third parties contracted by such owners, to install, maintain, and operate a renewable energy source device on or about the structure in which the business operates or on a property the business owns or leases; authorizing owners or contracted third parties to sell electricity generated from the device to certain businesses regardless of whether the device is located in a utility's service territory, etc.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/446 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/446/BillText/Filed/HTML |