FL S0450 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2019-37)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2019-37)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from public meetings requirements certain exempt information concerning information technology systems held by specified utilities; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records and Public Meetings/Local Government Utility
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 327 (Ch. 2019-37) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 327 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H327 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-37